+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 675, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On August 8, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Linthicum.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Barker, Nosse, Smith DB, Smith Warner.
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor