+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 259, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.