+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 113, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Girod, Winters.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/18/2019 2:46 PM)