+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 714, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
On August 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Johnson, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Linthicum.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Johnson, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar.
On July 3, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A6
Adopted (7/4/2017 9:33:51 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/5/2017 1:33:39 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/10/2017 10:24:08 AM)