+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/8/2019 3:58 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/8/2019 3:58 PM)