+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/4/2017 2:27:08 PM)