+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 222, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Thatcher; excused, 1--Burdick.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-20 by unanimous consent.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Hack, McLane, Parrish, Post, Weidner, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Boone, Nathanson.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2015 Calendar.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2015 Calendar.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #5433
4/13/2015 10:44:07 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor