+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 26--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1681
Adopted
Amendment #476
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor