+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.