+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 563, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2015.
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Taylor.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 51; Excused, 7--Gorsek, Heard, Kennemer, Rayfield, Reardon, Stark, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Fagan.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6967
5/27/2015 12:27:51 PM
Amendment #5603
4/14/2015 12:53:25 PM
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor