+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
- Motion to rerefer to Rules carried on voice vote.
On July 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from 07-07 Calendar and placed on 07-08 Calendar on voice vote.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. Refer to Rules by order of the President.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Gomberg.
- Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer,Conger. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 21--Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Witt.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #2967
Adopted
Amendment #2973
Not Adopted
Amendment #2950
Not Adopted
Amendment #2966
Not Adopted
Amendment #2944
Not Adopted
Amendment #2186
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor