+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 175, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Greenlick, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-11 by unanimous consent.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty, Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Lewis.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2017 Calendar.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (4/26/2017 3:58:14 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/29/2017 8:25:46 AM)