+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 174, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/10/2017 9:02:30 AM)