+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 98, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Cate, Wallan; Excused, 2--Drazan, Levy.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.