+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 634, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On July 27, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Findley, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith G.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
On June 13, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment -9
Proposed (4/6/2021 7:23 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/19/2021 5:08 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/22/2021 3:09 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (3/8/2021 2:38 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (3/8/2021 2:08 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/6/2021 11:12 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/19/2021 5:08 PM)