+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Trade.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.