+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/14/2017 11:54:51 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/14/2017 11:55:05 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor