+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 215, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Prozanski.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor