+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 386, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Girod declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Ferrioli, Whitsett.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 7--Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Krieger, Thatcher, Weidner; Absent, 1--Johnson; Excused, 1--Fagan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Revenue
Type:
Primary Sponsor