+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment 1
Proposed (4/27/2017 11:43:19 AM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor