+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 711, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Prozanski.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Beyer, Burdick, Dingfelder, Monnes Anderson, Prozanski, Rosenbaum, Shields.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 12--Barnhart, Barton, Dembrow, Gallegos, Gelser, Greenlick, Lively, Nathanson, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson; Excused, 1--Weidner.
- Second reading.
On July 5, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Land Use.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor