+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 327, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 42; Nays, 17--Bentz, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Gelser.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 7--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, George, Girod, Olsen, Whitsett.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-28 by unanimous consent.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Gomberg.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #2405
Adopted
Amendment #2326
Not Adopted
Amendment #2404
Adopted
Amendment #2323
Not Adopted
Amendment #2108
Not Adopted
Amendment #1412
Not Adopted