+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 637, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Smith.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Thatcher.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-17 by unanimous consent.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Fagan, Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Gilliam, Keny-Guyer, McKeown.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
6/6/2015 8:17:24 PM
Amendment #7403
6/6/2015 8:17:24 PM
Amendment #6449
5/5/2015 9:36:57 AM