+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 141, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Knopp declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Thomsen, Whitsett.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 2, 2015 Calendar.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2015 Calendar.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor