+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 476, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 18, 2015.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Burdick.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Barreto, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Krieger, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson, Witt; Excused, 2--Reardon, Stark.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2015 Calendar.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #5791
4/16/2015 7:19:19 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor