+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 92, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 24, 2021.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 12--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Lewis, Moore-Green, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark; Excused, 11--Alonso Leon, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Marsh, Speaker Kotek.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On COVID-19.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.