+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (5/25/2021 3:20 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (5/25/2021 6:55 PM)