+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 170, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-17 by unanimous consent.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Power.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.