+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Land Use.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #2057
Adopted
Amendment #1761
Not Adopted
Amendment #2056
Adopted
Amendment #1760
Not Adopted
Amendment #440
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor