+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 474, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 18, 2015.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bentz, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Post, Stark, Weidner, Wilson; Excused, 1--Barton.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 2--Beyer, Olsen.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Bentz, Heard, Johnson, McLane, Post, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 9, 2015 Calendar.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #
5/1/2015 4:23:29 PM
Amendment #7053
5/1/2015 4:23:29 PM
Amendment #6420
5/1/2015 4:23:29 PM
Amendment #5069
4/3/2015 12:56:22 PM