+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor by order of Speaker and then Revenue by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Business and Labor, and then to Revenue by prior reference.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/8/2019 12:02 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/8/2019 12:02 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/8/2019 12:02 PM)