+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 402, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Evans, Marsh, Parrish; Excused, 4--Boone, Lininger, McKeown, Piluso.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (5/19/2017 12:43:42 PM)
Amendment -A2
Proposed (5/4/2017 9:39:53 AM)
Amendment -A3
Proposed (5/4/2017 12:30:53 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/7/2017 1:04:35 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor