+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.