+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 636, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2015.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 53; Absent, 1--Nosse; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Vega Pederson.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #6688
5/18/2015 12:41:38 PM
Amendment #7345
6/3/2015 6:31:22 PM
Amendment #6479
5/6/2015 10:50:59 AM
Amendment #4623
3/20/2015 10:23:07 AM
Amendment #4071
2/25/2015 4:32:21 PM
Amendment #4140
2/25/2015 4:32:21 PM
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor