+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/14/2017 3:19:45 PM)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor