+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 463, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 15--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 2--Morgan, Wilde.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2021 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/5/2021 9:17 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/6/2021 9:30 AM)