+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 214, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #4932
3/31/2015 9:05:22 AM
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor