+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.