+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 364, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 37; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Weber, Wright; Excused, 5--Clem, Evans, Hayden, Lewis, Valderrama.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 10--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 19--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) (Not concurring: Robinson, Thomsen)
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng).
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 2--Levy, Smith Warner.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 37--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith G, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 2--Levy, Smith Warner.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -4
Adopted (5/19/2021 1:51 PM)
Amendment -MR3
Proposed (4/8/2021 3:17 PM)
Amendment -MR6
Proposed (5/27/2021 3:48 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/6/2021 11:03 AM)