+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 677, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
On August 6, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Absent, 1--Clem; Excused, 1--Smith G.
- Second reading.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment -23
Proposed (4/2/2021 6:01 PM)
Amendment -A28
Adopted (6/20/2021 9:14 PM)
Amendment -26
Adopted (4/7/2021 1:43 PM)
Amendment -21
Proposed (4/6/2021 10:39 AM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (4/6/2021 10:40 AM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (4/6/2021 10:40 AM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (4/6/2021 10:40 AM)