+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 25, 2015 Calendar.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (13)
Amendment #7629
6/18/2015 4:07:27 PM
Amendment #7565
6/17/2015 7:25:45 AM
Amendment #7271
6/2/2015 4:16:50 PM
Amendment #7095
5/29/2015 3:51:52 PM
Amendment #6768
5/20/2015 10:40:07 AM
Amendment #6130
4/20/2015 8:37:56 AM
Amendment #6131
4/20/2015 8:37:56 AM
Amendment #6129
4/20/2015 8:37:56 AM
Amendment #6128
4/20/2015 8:37:56 AM
Amendment #5889
4/16/2015 12:52:10 PM
Amendment #5887
4/16/2015 12:51:47 PM
Amendment #5888
4/16/2015 12:51:47 PM
Amendment #4601
3/19/2015 1:09:11 PM
+ − Sponsor
Health Care
Type:
Primary Sponsor