+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 63, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Shields declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 2, 2015 Calendar.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2015 Calendar.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #
3/25/2015 9:47:50 AM
Amendment #4766
3/25/2015 9:47:50 AM
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor