+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barreto. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boone, Power.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2017 Calendar.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation Policy.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/16/2017 2:35:31 PM)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor