+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 321, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-29 by unanimous consent.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Tomei. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--McKeown, Weidner.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 9, 2013 Calendar.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor