+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #2616
5/28/2013 1:43:36 PM
Amendment #2977
7/3/2013 11:08:02 AM
Amendment #2512
5/23/2013 11:56:51 AM
Amendment #2565
5/28/2013 8:50:27 AM
Amendment #5232
4/8/2015 12:10:19 PM