+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/17/2017 11:47:53 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor