+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/12/2017 3:54:53 PM)