+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 308, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen; Absent, 1--Knopp; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Drazan.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Rules.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (5/6/2019 1:14 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (5/1/2019 12:19 PM)