+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 461, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye.
- Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Wilde.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2021 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/1/2021 9:48 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/6/2021 10:08 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/5/2021 6:08 PM)