+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 657, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hernandez.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 29.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker.
- Subsequent referral to Student Success rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass, subsequent referral to Student Success be rescinded, and be referred to Revenue.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (6/10/2019 4:13 PM)